Frank Arthur Cooper (1872-1949): Elected 1915, 1918, 1920, 1923,
1926, 1929, 1932, 1935, 1938, 1941, 1944
Resigned 12 March 1946
Died 30 November 1949
--------------------------------------------------------------------
Premier to 7 March 1946
Chief Secretary to 7 March 1946
Leader of the Australian Labor Party to 6 March 1946
--------------------------------------------------------------------
Frank A Cooper
About
Lower House Contests
Election | Electorate | Party | Votes | Swing | Elected |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1944 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 0 | 0.00 | Yes |
1941 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 7141 | 0.00 | Yes |
1938 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 7099 | 0.00 | Yes |
1935 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 7166 | 0.00 | Yes |
1932 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 0 | 0.00 | Yes |
1929 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3080 | 0.00 | Yes |
1926 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3888 | 0.00 | Yes |
1923 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3086 | -5.90 | Yes |
1920 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3667 | -4.50 | Yes |
1918 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3678 | 0.00 | Yes |
1915 Queensland | Bremer | Australian Labor Party | 3157 | 0.00 | Yes |