William Forgan Smith (1887-1953): Elected 1915, 1918, 1920, 1923, 1926, 1929, 1932, 1935, 1938 Resigned 9 December 1942: see by-election
Later career: Chairman, Sugar Board and Central Sugar Cane Prices Board.
Chancellor, University of Queensland.
Died 23 September 1953
--------------------------------------------------------------------
Premier to 16 September 1942
Chief Secretary to 16 September 1942
Treasurer to 12 April 1938
Minister without Portfolio to 9 December 1942
Leader of the Labor Party to 9 September 1942
--------------------------------------------------------------------
Smith resigned partly through ill-health and partly because he (rightly) believed that the federal uniform tax acts of 1942 "would reduce the States to a condition of penurious dependence on the Federal government." (ADB) At his resignation he was the longest- serving Premier of Queensland.
W Forgan Smith
About
Lower House Contests
Election | Electorate | Party | Votes | Swing | Elected |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1941 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 6436 | 0.00 | Yes |
1938 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 7153 | 0.00 | Yes |
1935 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 6144 | 10.20 | Yes |
1932 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 4535 | 3.50 | Yes |
1929 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 3686 | 0.00 | Yes |
1926 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 3448 | 0.00 | Yes |
1923 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 2652 | 0.00 | Yes |
1920 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 2630 | -2.80 | Yes |
1918 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 2606 | 0.00 | Yes |
1915 Queensland | Mackay | Australian Labor Party | 2226 | 0.00 | Yes |